Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco de Aguiar y Seijas y Ulloa

Deceased

Archbishop of México, Federal District


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1642²Born
30 Aug 167735.6AppointedBishop of Michoacán, México
20 Nov 167836.8Ordained BishopBishop of Michoacán, México
20 Apr 168240.3AppointedArchbishop of México, Federal District
14 Aug 169856.6DiedArchbishop of México, Federal District

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Aguiar y Seijas y Ulloa
Archbishop Francisco de Aguiar y Seijas y Ulloa (born 1642, died ) Archbishop of México

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago de Compostela, Archdiocese of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
Ordained BishopCathedral, Tlaxcala, Diocese of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)
Death PlaceMexico, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 267, and Page 262
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 218, Number 1,355
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1678, Number 33
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 78, Number 6,312

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast