Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre de Cros, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Former Administrator of Arles, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo

Archbishop of Toulouse

Titular See: (pseudocardinal)


Events

DateEventTitle
1361²SelectedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
27 Jul 1362ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
8 Jun 1370AppointedArchbishop of Bourges, France
2 Aug 1374AppointedArchbishop of Arles, France
23 Jan 1379AppointedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
23 Dec 1383Elevated to Cardinal
23 Dec 1383AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
24 Dec 1383AppointedAdministrator of Arles, France
Jan 1388³ResignedAdministrator of Arles, France
16 Nov 1388DiedFormer Administrator of Arles, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Cros
Archbishop Pierre de Cros O.S.B. (died ) Former Administrator of Arles

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Chaul, Diocese of Limoges
Death PlaceAvignon
Buried Place (Original)Collège Saint-Martial, Church, Avignon

  • a cardinal for 4.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 390, and Page 139
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 103, and Page 488
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Dec 1383

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 22 Feb 2021

Quantcast