Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Pacifico Cembranos Nistral, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of San Miguel de Sucumbíos, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1876²Born
21 May 193761.3AppointedPrefect of San Miguel de Sucumbíos, Ecuador
195478.0ResignedPrefect of San Miguel de Sucumbíos, Ecuador
3 Jul 195579.5DiedPrefect Emeritus of San Miguel de Sucumbíos, Ecuador

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pacifico Cembranos Nistral
Father Pacifico Cembranos Nistral O.C.D. (born 1876, died ) Prefect Emeritus of San Miguel de Sucumbíos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVilla Pequite, Spain
Death PlaceQuito, Archdiocese of Quito

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • b: CB, 22 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast