Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean d’Auxois

Deceased

Bishop of Auxerre, France


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Sep 1342AppointedBishop of Troyes, France
30 Jan 1353AppointedBishop of Auxerre, France
10 Jan 1359DiedBishop of Auxerre, France

MicroData Summary for Jean d’Auxois
Bishop Jean d’Auxois (died ) Bishop of Auxerre

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 494, and Page 120

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Feb 2021

Quantcast