Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre d’André

Deceased

Bishop of Cambrai, France


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Oct 1340AppointedBishop of Noyon, France
25 Sep 1342AppointedBishop of Clermont, France
17 Feb 1349AppointedBishop of Cambrai, France
13 Sep 1368DiedBishop of Cambrai, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre d’André
Bishop Pierre d’André (died ) Bishop of Cambrai

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 372, and Page 192
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 160

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 Feb 2021

Quantcast