Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Myron Michael Daciuk, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Edmonton (Ukrainian), Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1919Born
15 Nov 194222.9Solemn VowsMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
10 Jun 194525.5Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
24 Jun 198262.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Winnipeg (Ukrainian), Manitoba, Canada
24 Jun 198262.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Thyatira
14 Oct 198262.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thyatira
28 Oct 199171.9AppointedBishop of Edmonton (Ukrainian), Canada
14 Jan 199676.1DiedBishop of Edmonton (Ukrainian), Canada

MicroData Summary for Myron Michael Daciuk
Bishop Myron Michael Daciuk O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Edmonton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMundare
Ordained BishopSts. Vladimir and Olga, Cathedral, Winnipeg, Archeparchy of Winnipeg (Ukrainian), Manitoba

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • c1/sole: CB, 12 Jan 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 76, Number 6,148

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast