Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean Cardinal de Cros

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateEventTitle
14 May 1347ConfirmedBishop of Limoges, France
30 May 1371AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
30 May 1371Elevated to Cardinal
28 Sep 1376AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
21 Nov 1383DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

MicroData Summary for Jean de Cros
Jean Cardinal de Cros (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChâteau, Calimafort, Diocese of Limoges, France
Death PlaceAvignon
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Avignon

  • a cardinal for 12.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 May 1371
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 301

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Mar 2021

Quantcast