Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean de Craon

Deceased

Archbishop of Reims, France


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Oct 1347AppointedBishop of Le Mans, France
31 Jul 1355AppointedArchbishop of Reims, France
26 Mar 1373DiedArchbishop of Reims, France

MicroData Summary for Jean de Craon
Archbishop Jean de Craon (died ) Archbishop of Reims

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 419, and Page 181

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 24 Feb 2021

Quantcast