Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Marcellino Cardinal Corio

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1664³Born
15 Jul 173974.8Elevated to Cardinal
30 Sep 173975.0InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
20 Feb 174277.4DiedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marcellino Corio
Marcellino Cardinal Corio (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 2.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Jul 1739

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast