Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edward Comerford

Deceased

Archbishop of Cashel, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1644¹Born
1669²25.0Ordained PriestPriest
15 Aug 169349.6SelectedArchbishop of Cashel, Ireland
14 Nov 169551.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Cashel, Ireland
28 Jun 1697³53.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cashel, Ireland
21 Feb 171066.1DiedArchbishop of Cashel, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edward Comerford
Archbishop Edward Comerford (born 1644, died ) Archbishop of Cashel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLismaley, Co. Tipperary
Ordained PriestRouen, Archdiocese of Rouen, France
Buried Place (Original)Thurles, Co. Tipperary

  • a priest for 41.1 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 147
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1697, Number 22
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast