Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Agapito Cardinal Colonna

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca

Bishop of Lisboa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1320¹Born
21 Jul 136343.5AppointedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
22 Oct 136949.8AppointedBishop of Brescia, Italy
11 Aug 137151.6AppointedBishop of Lisboa, Portugal
18 Sep 137858.7Elevated to Cardinal
18 Sep 137858.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
3 Oct 1380³60.7DiedBishop of Lisboa, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agapito Colonna (VIAF: 37305208)
Agapito Cardinal Colonna (born 1320, died )

EventPlace
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Santa Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 2.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Sep 1378
  • b: CB, 21 Feb 2019
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 111, and Page 147
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 507
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast