Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Collins

Deceased

Bishop of Cloyne and Ross, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1780¹Born
24 Apr 182747.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Cloyne and Ross, Ireland
24 Apr 182747.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Spiga(z) (or Pegae)
8 Jul 182747.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Spiga(z) (or Pegae)
9 Aug 183151.6SucceededBishop of Cloyne and Ross, Ireland
8 Dec 183252.9DiedBishop of Cloyne and Ross, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michael Collins (VIAF: 315682085)
Bishop Michael Collins (born 1780, died ) Bishop of Cloyne and Ross

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRossmore, Co. Cork
Ordained BishopMaynooth College
Buried Place (Original)St. Patrick's, Cathedral, Skibbereen, Diocese of Cloyne and Ross

  • a bishop for 5.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1828
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 154, and Page 350
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1827, Number 26
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 21
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Number 7,168

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast