Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Collesius, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Stefaniaco e Benda, Albania

Bishop of Albania

Apostolic Administrator of Durrės (Durazzo)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1570¹Born
31 Aug 161545.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Stefaniaco e Benda, Albania
31 Aug 161545.6AppointedBishop of Albania
8 Sep 161545.6Ordained BishopBishop of Albania
1625¹55.0ResignedCoadjutor Bishop of Stefaniaco e Benda, Albania
14 Feb 162656.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Durrės (Durazzo), Albania
1635²65.0DiedApostolic Administrator of Durrės (Durazzo), Albania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Collesius
Bishop Giovanni Collesius O.F.M. Obs. (born 1570, died 1635) Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Stefaniaco e Benda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarraba

  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 74, and Page 322
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 58, Number 333
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1615, Number 23
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 304

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast