Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas CoŽffeteau, O.P. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Metz, France

Titular Bishop of Dardanus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1574¹Born
12 Jun 161743.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Metz, France
12 Jun 161743.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Dardanus
22 Aug 162147.6SelectedBishop of Marseille, France
21 Apr 162349.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Metz, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolas CoŽffeteau (VIAF: 2522060)
Bishop Nicolas CoŽffeteau O.P. (born 1574, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Metz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Calais

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 234, and Page 172

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast