Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernardo de Sédirac (de Cluny), O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Toledo, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Oct 1088AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
6 Dec 1088Ordained BishopArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
6 Jun 1124DiedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo de Sédirac (de Cluny)
Archbishop Bernardo de Sédirac (de Cluny) O.S.B. (died ) Archbishop of Toledo

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceToledo, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 35.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 287, Number 16
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,794

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast