Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bonaventura Claverio, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Potenza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1606¹Born
8 May 164640.3SelectedBishop of Potenza, Italy
16 Jul 164640.5ConfirmedBishop of Potenza, Italy
22 Jul 164640.5Ordained BishopBishop of Potenza, Italy
1671¹65.0DiedBishop of Potenza, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bonaventura Claverio
Bishop Bonaventura Claverio O.F.M. Conv. (born 1606, died 1671) Bishop of Potenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVigevano
Ordained BishopBorghese Chapel, Santa Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 287
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 322
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1646, Number 12
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 71, Number 5,628

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast