Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teodoro Isidoro Clarius de Brescia, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Foligno, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Jan 1547AppointedBishop of Foligno, Italy
17 Apr 1547Ordained BishopBishop of Foligno, Italy
18 Mar 1555DiedBishop of Foligno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Teodoro Isidoro Clarius de Brescia
Bishop Teodoro Isidoro Clarius de Brescia O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Foligno

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 199
  • ob/c2+: CB, 18 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1547, Number 5
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 90, Number 7,610

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast