Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Barthelemy Chouet (Cueti)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nice, France


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Apr 1462SelectedBishop of Nice, France
29 Apr 1462ConfirmedBishop of Nice, France
1469²AppointedApostolic Administrator of Lausanne, Switzerland
1472²ResignedApostolic Administrator of Lausanne, Switzerland
1501¹ResignedBishop of Nice, France
12 Jun 1501DiedBishop Emeritus of Nice, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Barthelemy Chouet (Cueti)
Bishop Barthelemy Chouet (Cueti) (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nice

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 202
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1462, Number 20*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 25 Jul 2021

Quantcast