Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Piotr Chotkowski

Deceased

Bishop of Płock, Poland


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Dec 1480AppointedBishop of Płock, Poland
24 Jun 1481Ordained BishopBishop of Płock, Poland
15 Aug 1497DiedBishop of Płock, Poland

MicroData Summary for Piotr Chotkowski
Bishop Piotr Chotkowski (died ) Bishop of Płock

EventPlace
Ordained BishopOporow

  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 217
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,384
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1481, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast