Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Chishull

Deceased

Bishop of London, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Dec 1273AppointedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
29 Apr 1274Ordained BishopBishop of London, England, Great Britain
8 Feb 1280DiedBishop of London, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Chishull
Bishop John Chishull (died ) Bishop of London

EventPlace
Ordained BishopLambeth

  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 64
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 287
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 84, Number 6,890

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Feb 2021

Quantcast