Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuliano Cardinal Cesarini (Sr.)

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Administrator of Grosseto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1398²Born
24 May 142628.3Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
8 Nov 143032.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
8 Nov 143032.8Elevated to Cardinal
Feb 1439³41.0AppointedAdministrator of Grosseto, Italy
1440¹42.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
1440¹42.0AppointedAdministrator of Taranto, Italy
7 Mar 144446.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
10 Nov 144446.8DiedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuliano Cesarini (Sr.)
Giuliano Cardinal Cesarini (Sr.) (born 1398, died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 18.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 May 1426
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 161

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast