Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymond CavalÚsy, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nţmes, France

Archbishop of Narbonne


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Oct 1573AppointedBishop of Nţmes, France
3 Oct 1588AppointedArchbishop of Narbonne, France
22 Aug 1594DiedBishop of Nţmes, France

MicroData Summary for Raymond CavalÚsy
Bishop Raymond CavalÚsy O.P. (died ) Bishop of Nţmes

EventPlace
Death PlaceNţmes, Diocese of Nţmes

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1573, Number 43*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 255, and Page 253

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 1 Mar 2021

Quantcast