Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonino Cavaleri

Deceased

Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1719Born
22 Dec 174223.2Ordained PriestPriest of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
9 Apr 176444.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
9 Apr 176444.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Erythrae
29 Jul 176444.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Erythrae
4 Aug 178868.9SelectedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
15 Sep 178869.0ConfirmedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
11 Dec 179273.2DiedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonino Cavaleri
Bishop Antonino Cavaleri (born , died ) Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAgrigento
Ordained BishopCathedral, Monreale, Archdiocese of Monreale

  • a priest for 49.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 71, and Page 210
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 451
  • ob/c2+: CB, 13 Jan 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1764, Number 26
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 44, Number 2,990

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast