Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Paolo Caputo

Deceased

Bishop of Larino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1594¹Born
3 Apr 162834.2AppointedBishop of Larino, Italy
30 Apr 162834.3Ordained BishopBishop of Larino, Italy
29 Jul 162834.5DiedBishop of Larino, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Paolo Caputo
Bishop Pietro Paolo Caputo (born 1594, died ) Bishop of Larino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopGes¨, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Larino, Diocese of Larino

  • a bishop for .2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 215
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1628, Number 25
  • ob/c2: AT, 18 Mar 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,073

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast