Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Domenico Cardinal Capranica

Deceased

Administrator of Fermo, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1400Born
23 Jul 142323.1Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
3 Dec 142525.5AppointedBishop of Fermo, Italy
8 Nov 143030.4AppointedAdministrator of Fermo, Italy
8 Nov 143030.4Elevated to Cardinal
8 Nov 143030.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
May 1443¹42.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
14 Aug 145858.2DiedAdministrator of Fermo, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Capranica (VIAF: 3282390)
Domenico Cardinal Capranica (born , died ) Administrator of Fermo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCapranica Prenestina

  • a cardinal for 35.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Jul 1423
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 154

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 31 Jul 2021

Quantcast