Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre de Canillac

Deceased

Bishop of Maguelonne, France


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Jan 1353AppointedBishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France
29 Jan 1361AppointedBishop of Maguelonne, France
7 Jul 1361DiedBishop of Maguelonne, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Canillac
Bishop Pierre de Canillac (died ) Bishop of Maguelonne

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 406, and Page 320

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 22 Feb 2021

Quantcast