Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicola Canali

Deceased

Archbishop of Patrae Veteres (Patras), Greece


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Jul 1342AppointedBishop of Bergamo, Italy
25 Sep 1342AppointedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
23 May 1347AppointedArchbishop of Patrae Veteres (Patras), Greece
1350¹DiedArchbishop of Patrae Veteres (Patras), Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicola Canali
Archbishop Nicola Canali (died 1350) Archbishop of Patrae Veteres (Patras)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 415, and Page 393
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 396

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Jun 2021

Quantcast