Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Prospero Cardinal Caffarelli

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Callisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1592Born
2 Mar 165462.1Elevated to Cardinal
23 Mar 165462.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
14 Aug 165967.6DiedCardinal-Priest of San Callisto

MicroData Summary for Prospero Caffarelli
Prospero Cardinal Caffarelli (born 1592, died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Callisto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 5.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Mar 1654

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast