Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Cadogan, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Apr 1215AppointedBishop of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain
21 Jun 1215Ordained BishopBishop of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain
1236¹ResignedBishop of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain
11 Apr 1241DiedBishop Emeritus of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martin Cadogan
Bishop Martin Cadogan O. Cist. (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bangor

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLlandyfai
Ordained BishopStaines

  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 55
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 97
  • bp/cist: CB, 14 Mar 2016
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 92, Number 7,799

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast