Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francis Burke

Deceased

Archbishop of Tuam, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Sep 1713AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Tuam, Ireland
20 Sep 1713AppointedTitular Archbishop of Miletopolis
31 Oct 1713SucceededArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland
15 Apr 1714Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland
23 Sep 1723DiedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Francis Burke
Archbishop Francis Burke (died ) Archbishop of Tuam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArchdiocese of Tuam
Buried Place (Original)Church, Clonbern

  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 393, and Page 268
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 6
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 60, Number 4,490
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast