Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso de Burgos, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Palencia, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Apr 1477AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
8 Jul 1482AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
26 Aug 1485AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
1499¹DiedBishop of Palencia, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso de Burgos
Bishop Alfonso de Burgos O.P. (died 1499) Bishop of Palencia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 210, and Page 133
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 136
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1477, Number 28*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast