Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Burghersh

Deceased

Bishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
27 May 1320AppointedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
20 Jul 1320Ordained BishopBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
4 Dec 1340DiedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Henry Burghersh
Bishop Henry Burghersh (died ) Bishop of Lincoln

EventPlace
Ordained BishopBoulogne sur mer, France

  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 306
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 72
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 14
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 83, Number 6,759

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast