Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Buonincontro

Deceased

Bishop of Verona, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Dec 1295SelectedBishop of Verona, Italy
15 Jan 1296Ordained BishopBishop of Verona, Italy
14 Jun 1298DiedBishop of Verona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Buonincontro
Bishop Buonincontro (died ) Bishop of Verona

  • a bishop for 2.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 522

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 10 May 2021

Quantcast