Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luiz de Brito Homem

Deceased

Bishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1748Born
20 Sep 177729.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jul 179142.9SelectedBishop of Angola e Congo
19 Dec 179143.3ConfirmedBishop of Angola e Congo
29 Apr 179243.7Ordained BishopBishop of Angola e Congo
16 Mar 180253.6SelectedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
24 May 180253.7ConfirmedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
10 Dec 181365.3DiedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Luiz de Brito Homem
Bishop Luiz de Brito Homem (born , died ) Bishop of São Luís do Maranhão

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFundão

  • a priest for 36.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 245
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 179
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 Apr 2021

Quantcast