Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Bravo de Laguna, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nicaragua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1616¹Born
Jul 166448.5SelectedBishop of Nicaragua
1 Sep 167054.6ConfirmedBishop of Nicaragua
21 Sep 167155.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nicaragua
9 Jun 167458.4DiedBishop of Nicaragua

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Bravo de Laguna
Bishop Alfonso Bravo de Laguna O.F.M. (born 1616, died ) Bishop of Nicaragua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTepeaca, México

  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 287
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,098
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 47
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 74, Number 5,894

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast