Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop János Bradács, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1732³Born
30 Sep 175523.6Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
27 Jan 176835.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
27 Jan 176835.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhosus
20 Apr 176836.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhosus
16 Jan 177138.9SelectedBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
23 Sep 177139.6ConfirmedBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
4 Jul 177240.3DiedBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for János Bradács
Bishop János Bradács O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorisky
Ordained BishopMaria Pocs, Austria

  • a priest for 16.7 years
  • a bishop for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 297, and Page 357
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 453
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,437
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1768, Number 12
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 39, Number 2,396
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast