Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Bonilla, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ariano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1636³Born
28 Feb 168952.8AppointedBishop of Ariano, Italy
6 Mar 168952.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ariano, Italy
Apr 1696³59.9DiedBishop of Ariano, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Bonilla
Bishop Juan Bonilla O. Carm. (born , died Apr 1696) Bishop of Ariano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValladolid, Diocese of Valladolid, Spain
Ordained BishopS. Maria Transpontina, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 98, and Page 172
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 230, Number 1,433
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1689, Number 4
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 76, Number 6,072

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast