Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dietrich von Bocksdorf

Deceased

Bishop of Naumburg, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
25 May 1464SelectedBishop of Naumburg, Germany
26 Jun 1464ConfirmedBishop of Naumburg, Germany
26 Aug 1464Ordained BishopBishop of Naumburg, Germany
9 Mar 1466DiedBishop of Naumburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Dietrich von Bocksdorf (VIAF: 84766621)
Bishop Dietrich von Bocksdorf (died ) Bishop of Naumburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZinnitz
Ordained BishopZeitz
Death PlaceZeitz

  • a bishop for 1.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 206
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,776
  • ob/c2: ATh
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1464, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast