Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Bintworth

Deceased

Bishop of London, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
4 May 1338SelectedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
23 May 1338ConfirmedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
12 Jul 1338Ordained BishopBishop of London, England, Great Britain
8 Dec 1339DiedBishop of London, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Richard Bintworth
Bishop Richard Bintworth (died ) Bishop of London

EventPlace
Ordained BishopLambeth

  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 311
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 75
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 290
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 83, Number 6,781

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast