Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Cristóbal de Quirós

Deceased

Bishop of Popayán, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1618²Born
1 Sep 167052.6AppointedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
24 Aug 167153.6Ordained BishopBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
16 May 167254.3AppointedBishop of Popayán, Colombia
11 May 168466.3DiedBishop of Popayán, Colombia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Cristóbal de Quirós
Bishop Bernardo Cristóbal de Quirós (born 1618, died ) Bishop of Popayán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Spain

  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 148
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 207, Number 1,293
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast