Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri Bayler

Deceased

Bishop of Alet, France


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Mar 1387AppointedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
15 Jun 1388AppointedBishop of Valence and Die, France
27 May 1390AppointedBishop of Alet, France
1420¹DiedBishop of Alet, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Henri Bayler
Bishop Henri Bayler (died 1420) Bishop of Alet

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 237, and Page 513
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 204

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Mar 2021

Quantcast