Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista Bavestrelli

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Constantinople, Turkey

Titular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1710Born
12 May 174736.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Smirne, Turkey
16 Sep 175444.0AppointedBishop of Chios (Scio), Greece
29 Jun 175544.8Ordained BishopBishop of Chios (Scio), Greece
31 Aug 177262.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Constantinople, Turkey
31 Aug 177262.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa
20 Apr 177766.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Constantinople, Turkey

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Bavestrelli
Archbishop Giovanni Battista Bavestrelli (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Constantinople

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConstantinople
Ordained BishopConstantinople

  • a bishop for 21.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 164, and Page 233
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 383, and Page 455
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1755, Number 22
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 87, Number 7,293

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast