Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo

Deceased

Bishop of Cardica, Greece


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Oct 1208AppointedBishop of Cardica, Greece
25 May 1212ConfirmedBishop of Dimitri, Greece
2 Apr 1217ResignedBishop of Dimitri, Greece

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo
Bishop Bartolomeo , Bishop of Cardica

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 166, and Page 222

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Aug 2021

Quantcast