Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Aroutin

Deceased

Bishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Maronite), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1788Born
4 Jun 181627.4Ordained PriestPriest of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Maronite), Syria
1829²40.0AppointedBishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Maronite), Syria
3 May 182940.3Ordained BishopBishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Maronite), Syria
21 Apr 185162.3DiedBishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Maronite), Syria

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul Aroutin
Bishop Paul Aroutin (born , died ) Bishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAleppo
Ordained BishopBkerki

  • a priest for 34.8 years
  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1829, Number 10
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 62, Number 4,729

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast