Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio de Rossi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Jan 1392AppointedBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy
13 Oct 1400AppointedBishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy
4 Jan 1402AppointedBishop of Isola, Italy
2 Oct 1402AppointedBishop of Isernia, Italy
12 Jul 1404AppointedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
1411¹RemovedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio de Rossi
Bishop Antonio de Rossi , Bishop Emeritus of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 478, and Page 287
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 285, and Page 268
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 269

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 May 2021

Quantcast