Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Alvarez de Quiñones

Deceased

Bishop of Sigüenza, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1642³Born
27 May 168644.0AppointedArchbishop of Messina, Italy
3 Jun 168644.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Messina, Italy
15 Sep 169856.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Sigüenza, Spain
22 Sep 171068.3DiedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Alvarez de Quiñones
Archbishop Francisco Alvarez de Quiñones (born , died ) Bishop of Sigüenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLagüeles
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 24.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 266, and Page 351
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 228, Number 1,420
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1686, Number 30
  • ob: AT, 24 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Feb 2021

Quantcast