Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Silvestro Cardinal Aldobrandini, O.S.Io.Hieros. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1587Born
17 Sep 160316.7Elevated to Cardinal
5 Nov 160316.8InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio
28 Jan 161225.0DiedCardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio

MicroData Summary for Silvestro Aldobrandini
Silvestro Cardinal Aldobrandini O.S.Io.Hieros. (born 1587, died ) Cardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 8.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Sep 1603

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast