Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Joseph Odon Alardo, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Saint-Maurice et Saint-Maur de Clervaux {Santi Maurizio e Mauro di Clervaux}, Luxembourg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1887Born
20 May 190921.6Simple VowsMember of Order of Saint Benedict
1 Jul 191224.8Solemn VowsMember of Order of Saint Benedict
28 Mar 191426.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
4 Aug 193749.8AppointedAbbot of Saint-Maurice et Saint-Maur de Clervaux {Santi Maurizio e Mauro di Clervaux}, Luxembourg
194456.3ResignedAbbot of Saint-Maurice et Saint-Maur de Clervaux {Santi Maurizio e Mauro di Clervaux}, Luxembourg
10 Aug 196072.9DiedAbbot Emeritus of Saint-Maurice et Saint-Maur de Clervaux {Santi Maurizio e Mauro di Clervaux}, Luxembourg

MicroData Summary for Joseph Odon Alardo
Abbot Joseph Odon Alardo O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Saint-Maurice et Saint-Maur de Clervaux {Santi Maurizio e Mauro di Clervaux}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDinant, Belgium
Death PlaceTerriter, Switzerland

  • a priest for 46.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Sep 2021

Quantcast