Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Troilo Agnesi

Deceased

Bishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Oct 1482AppointedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
17 Dec 1483AppointedBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
26 Jan 1487AppointedBishop of Lavello, Italy
4 Jul 1498AppointedBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy
1502¹DiedBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Troilo Agnesi
Bishop Troilo Agnesi (died 1502) Bishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 174, and Page 162
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 250, and Page 214
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1482, Number 48*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast