Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Saitama

Dioecesis Saitamaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Vacant
  • Peter Takeo Okada, Apostolic Administrator
  • Marcellino Taiji Tani, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 31 March 2003
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Tōkyō
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Japan
  • Square Kilometers: 22,604 (8,730 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://saitama-kyoku.net/
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's Residence, 6-4-12 Tokiwa, Urawa-ku, Saitama-shi, 336-0001, Japan
  • Telephone: (048)831-3150
  • Fax: 824-3532

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Urawa
4 January 1939ErectedDiocese of Yokohama Prefecture Apostolic of Urawa (erected)
Diocese of Urawa
16 December 1957ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Urawa Diocese of Urawa
Diocese of Saitama
31 March 2003Name ChangedDiocese of Urawa Diocese of Saitama

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Urawa
19502,8077,221,286.0%1161716512512ap1951
Diocese of Urawa
197010,6328,983,110.1%966751417614744ap1971
198012,98111,429,000.1%1364771687916546ap1981
199016,76113,048,924.1%1652682466318659ap1991
199978,99413,928,489.6%1544591,33825316860ap2000
200079,12913,974,550.6%1546611,29725617660ap2001
200187,20814,037,331.6%1348611,42915817260ap2002
200287,31213,965,767.6%1551661,32215918560ap2003
Diocese of Saitama
200389,91314,045,552.6%1652681,32226017659ap2004
200490,46314,179,715.6%1743601,50735019157ap2005
2010100,47714,139,486.7%1837551,82654116859ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 27 Jul 2013